1 | 1 | | 88R3703 JG-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Moody H.B. No. 1397 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the provision of community recovery organization |
---|
8 | 8 | | peer-to-peer services under Medicaid. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is |
---|
11 | 11 | | amended by adding Section 531.09991 to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 531.09991. COMMUNITY RECOVERY ORGANIZATIONS. (a) In |
---|
13 | 13 | | this section, "community recovery organization" means a nonprofit |
---|
14 | 14 | | organization that: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) mobilizes resources inside and outside of a local |
---|
16 | 16 | | community to increase the prevalence and quality of long-term |
---|
17 | 17 | | recovery for individuals with a substance use or mental health |
---|
18 | 18 | | condition and their affected family members; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (2) is governed by members of the local community: |
---|
20 | 20 | | (A) at least 51 percent of whom identify as an |
---|
21 | 21 | | individual recovering from a substance use or mental health |
---|
22 | 22 | | condition; and |
---|
23 | 23 | | (B) the remainder of whom identify as an affected |
---|
24 | 24 | | family member of an individual recovering from a substance use or |
---|
25 | 25 | | mental health condition; and |
---|
26 | 26 | | (3) aligns with applicable national best practices |
---|
27 | 27 | | recognized by the commission. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) The executive commissioner shall adopt rules to provide |
---|
29 | 29 | | Medicaid reimbursement for peer-to-peer services provided by |
---|
30 | 30 | | community recovery organizations, which must include: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) rules that establish training requirements for |
---|
32 | 32 | | community recovery organization peer-to-peer service providers; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (2) rules that establish certification and |
---|
34 | 34 | | supervision requirements for community recovery organizations; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (3) rules that define the scope of peer-to-peer |
---|
36 | 36 | | services that community recovery organizations may provide; |
---|
37 | 37 | | (4) rules that distinguish peer-to-peer services |
---|
38 | 38 | | provided by community recovery organizations from other services |
---|
39 | 39 | | that a person must hold a license to provide; and |
---|
40 | 40 | | (5) any other rules necessary to protect the health |
---|
41 | 41 | | and safety of individuals receiving services provided by community |
---|
42 | 42 | | recovery organizations. |
---|
43 | 43 | | (c) The executive commissioner shall establish a work group |
---|
44 | 44 | | to provide input for the adoption of rules under Subsection (b) and |
---|
45 | 45 | | shall consider that input in adopting rules under that subsection. |
---|
46 | 46 | | The work group is composed of at least nine but not more than 13 |
---|
47 | 47 | | members with expertise in substance use disorder recovery or |
---|
48 | 48 | | community recovery organizations. The executive commissioner |
---|
49 | 49 | | shall ensure that at least half of the work group members are from |
---|
50 | 50 | | rural communities in this state. |
---|
51 | 51 | | (d) The executive commissioner shall appoint one work group |
---|
52 | 52 | | member to serve as presiding officer. |
---|
53 | 53 | | (e) The work group is automatically abolished on the |
---|
54 | 54 | | adoption of rules under Subsection (b). |
---|
55 | 55 | | (f) Subsections (c), (d), and (e) and this subsection expire |
---|
56 | 56 | | September 1, 2025. |
---|
57 | 57 | | SECTION 2. Effective January 1, 2025, Section 32.024, Human |
---|
58 | 58 | | Resources Code, is amended by adding Subsection (pp) to read as |
---|
59 | 59 | | follows: |
---|
60 | 60 | | (pp) The commission in the commission's rules and standards |
---|
61 | 61 | | governing the scope of services provided under the medical |
---|
62 | 62 | | assistance program shall include peer-to-peer services provided by |
---|
63 | 63 | | community recovery organizations as defined by Section 531.09991, |
---|
64 | 64 | | Government Code, to the extent permitted by federal law. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 3. Not later than December 31, 2023, the executive |
---|
66 | 66 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
67 | 67 | | establish the work group required by Section 531.09991, Government |
---|
68 | 68 | | Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
69 | 69 | | SECTION 4. Not later than December 31, 2024, the executive |
---|
70 | 70 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission shall |
---|
71 | 71 | | adopt the rules required by Section 531.09991, Government Code, as |
---|
72 | 72 | | added by this Act. |
---|
73 | 73 | | SECTION 5. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
74 | 74 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
75 | 75 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
76 | 76 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
77 | 77 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
78 | 78 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
79 | 79 | | SECTION 6. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this |
---|
80 | 80 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2023. |
---|