Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB14 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 6, 2023
Bill March 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 5, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 19, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Bill April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 20, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2023
Bill May 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill April 5, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 19, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note March 31, 2023
Fiscal Note March 20, 2023