Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1432 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023
Bill January 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 21, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 18, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 19, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 25, 2023
Bill May 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2023
Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 18, 2023
Analysis April 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note March 28, 2023