House | 04/18/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1636 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to County Affairs | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 452 | |
House | 01/18/2023 | Filed |