Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 24, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 16, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023