Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1503 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 20, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 19, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note April 11, 2023
Fiscal Note March 30, 2023