Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1504 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 20, 2023
Bill January 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill April 14, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 20, 2023