LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1510
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1510
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1510
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/13/2023
9:00 am
Public Health Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
JHR 120
HB181
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
HB248
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
HB299
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
HB362
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/12/2023 S Referred to Criminal Justice
HB861
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB1190
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/11/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB1488
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1510
Introduced
Last Action: 03/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1805
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/03/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs