Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1513 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 88R1711 RDS-D
22 By: Vasut H.B. No. 1513
33
44
55 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
66 AN ACT
77 relating to the elimination of ad valorem taxes and the creation of
88 a joint interim committee on the elimination of those taxes.
99 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1010 SECTION 1. (a) In this section, "committee" means the joint
1111 interim committee on the elimination of ad valorem taxes.
1212 (b) The joint interim committee on the elimination of ad
1313 valorem taxes is composed of:
1414 (1) five members of the house of representatives
1515 appointed by the speaker of the house of representatives; and
1616 (2) five senators appointed by the lieutenant
1717 governor.
1818 (c) The speaker of the house of representatives and the
1919 lieutenant governor shall make the appointments under Subsection
2020 (b) of this section not later than November 1, 2023.
2121 (d) The speaker of the house of representatives and the
2222 lieutenant governor shall each designate a co-chair from among the
2323 committee members.
2424 (e) The committee shall convene at the joint call of the
2525 co-chairs.
2626 (f) The committee has all other powers and duties provided
2727 to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and
2828 house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government
2929 Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on
3030 administration.
3131 (g) The committee shall conduct a comprehensive study of
3232 alternative methods of taxation to replace local tax revenue that
3333 will be lost when ad valorem taxes are eliminated.
3434 (h) For each alternative method of taxation considered by
3535 the committee, the committee shall:
3636 (1) consider whether political subdivisions that
3737 currently impose ad valorem taxes would have the authority to
3838 impose the proposed alternative tax;
3939 (2) determine the average tax rate for the proposed
4040 alternative tax imposed by each type of political subdivision that
4141 would be necessary to generate the same amount of tax revenue as the
4242 amount of tax revenue lost as a result of the elimination of ad
4343 valorem taxes;
4444 (3) determine, if appropriate, the effect that
4545 broadening the application of the proposed alternative tax at the
4646 local level would have on the tax rates identified under
4747 Subdivision (2) of this subsection;
4848 (4) identify whether tax revenue generated by the
4949 proposed alternative tax would require redistribution to offset
5050 disparities in available local tax revenue as a result of the
5151 elimination of ad valorem taxes and, if so, evaluate the different
5252 mechanisms of redistribution available; and
5353 (5) identify and examine any other issue that would
5454 need to be addressed to implement the elimination of ad valorem
5555 taxes.
5656 (i) On request of the committee, a state agency or political
5757 subdivision shall provide information for and assistance in
5858 conducting the study under this section.
5959 (j) Not later than November 1, 2024, the committee shall
6060 prepare and submit to the legislature a written report containing
6161 the results of the study and any recommendations for legislative or
6262 other action.
6363 (k) The committee is abolished and this section expires
6464 January 1, 2025.
6565 SECTION 2. (a) Title 1, Tax Code, is repealed.
6666 (b) Notwithstanding any other law, this state or a political
6767 subdivision of this state may not impose an ad valorem tax. To the
6868 extent of a conflict, this section controls over a conflicting
6969 provision in a general or special law.
7070 (c) The change in law made by this section does not affect
7171 tax liability accruing before the effective date of this section.
7272 That liability continues in effect as if this section had not been
7373 enacted, and the former law is continued in effect for the
7474 collection of taxes due and for civil and criminal enforcement of
7575 the liability for those taxes.
7676 (d) This section takes effect January 1, 2033.
7777 SECTION 3. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
7878 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.