Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1525 Meeting Schedule

Calendar

Date
Event
Location
04/11/2023 8:00 am
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/20/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective immediately
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Received from the House
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Received from the House
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Local Government
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
Introduced
Last Action: 04/11/2023 H Left pending in committee