LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1544
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1544
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1544
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/26/2023
10:30 am
Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.030
HB1120
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/16/2023 S Referred to State Affairs
HB1544
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/05/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars
HB1842
Introduced
Last Action: 04/27/2023 H Reported favorably as substituted
HB2671
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
SB718
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23