E
|
06/18/2023
|
Effective on 9/1/23
|
|
|
E
|
06/18/2023
|
Filed without the Governor's signature
|
|
Journal Page: 6492
|
E
|
05/24/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5620
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/22/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4980
|
House
|
05/20/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4998
|
House
|
05/19/2023
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4829
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2216
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2065
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Referred to Business & Commerce
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 973
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1530
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#199
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1475
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1461
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1461
|
House
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 959
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1090
|
House
|
03/03/2023
|
Referred to Insurance
|
|
Journal Page: 461
|
House
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|