LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1571
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1571
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1571
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/28/2023
8:00 am
Human Services Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.030
HB940
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB1238
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/05/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB1571
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1879
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/23/2023 S Placed on intent calendar
HB2439
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB2473
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB2802
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/11/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2983
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/01/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB3189
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/26/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB3584
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB4065
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/19/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HCR37
Introduced
Last Action: 05/02/2023 S Referred to Administration
HB1185
Introduced
Last Action: 03/28/2023 H Withdrawn from schedule