E | 06/12/2023 | Effective on 9/1/23 | ||
E | 06/12/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6491 | |
E | 05/28/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 6489 | |
Senate | 05/28/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 3177 | |
House | 05/26/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 5890 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 5896 | |
House | 05/25/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 5295 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2749 | |
Senate | 05/24/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/23/2023 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/20/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2242 | |
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/19/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3892 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1509 | Journal Page: 3892 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3892 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3891 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3818 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3818 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1841 | |
House | 04/05/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/03/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 03/03/2023 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 463 | |
House | 01/24/2023 | Filed |