Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1577 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/20/2023

                    By: Hull, Herrero (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 1577
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2023;
 May 15, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Criminal
 Justice; May 19, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 19, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to changing the eligibility for mandatory supervision of
 an inmate serving a sentence for or previously convicted of certain
 assaults.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 508.149(a), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (a)  An inmate may not be released to mandatory supervision
 if the inmate is serving a sentence for or has been previously
 convicted of:
 (1)  an offense for which the judgment contains an
 affirmative finding under Article 42A.054(c) or (d), Code of
 Criminal Procedure;
 (2)  a first degree felony or a second degree felony
 under Section 19.02, Penal Code;
 (3)  a capital felony under Section 19.03, Penal Code;
 (4)  a first degree felony or a second degree felony
 under Section 20.04, Penal Code;
 (5)  an offense under Section 21.11, Penal Code;
 (6)  a felony under Section 22.011, Penal Code;
 (7)  a first degree felony or a second degree felony
 under Section 22.02, Penal Code;
 (8)  a first degree felony under Section 22.021, Penal
 Code;
 (9)  a first degree felony under Section 22.04, Penal
 Code;
 (10)  a first degree felony under Section 28.02, Penal
 Code;
 (11)  a second degree felony under Section 29.02, Penal
 Code;
 (12)  a first degree felony under Section 29.03, Penal
 Code;
 (13)  a first degree felony under Section 30.02, Penal
 Code;
 (14)  a felony for which the punishment is increased
 under Section 481.134 or [Section] 481.140, Health and Safety Code;
 (15)  an offense under Section 43.25, Penal Code;
 (16)  an offense under Section 21.02, Penal Code;
 (17)  a first degree felony under Section 15.03, Penal
 Code;
 (18)  an offense under Section 43.05, Penal Code;
 (19)  an offense under Section 20A.02, Penal Code;
 (20)  an offense under Section 20A.03, Penal Code;
 (21)  a first degree felony under Section 71.02 or
 71.023, Penal Code; [or]
 (22)  an offense under Section 481.1123, Health and
 Safety Code, punished under Subsection (d), (e), or (f) of that
 section;
 (23)  a second degree felony under Section 22.01, Penal
 Code; or
 (24)  an offense under Section 22.01, Penal Code,
 punished under Subsection (b)(2), (7), or (8) of that section.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an offense committed on or after the effective date of this Act.
 An offense committed before the effective date of this Act is
 governed by the law in effect on the date the offense was committed,
 and the former law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *