E
|
06/13/2023
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
06/13/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6491
|
E
|
05/30/2023
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6489
|
Senate
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3303
|
House
|
05/29/2023
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6485
|
House
|
05/28/2023
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6488
|
Senate
|
05/27/2023
|
Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 121
|
Journal Page: 3107
|
House
|
05/24/2023
|
House adopts resolution for tech. correction
|
HCR 121
|
Journal Page: 5286
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 2029
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1802
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4476
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/15/2023
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1802
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/12/2023
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4219
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA5 Kolkhorst
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA5 Kolkhorst
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1848
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA4 Hughes
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment(s) offered FA3 Parker
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
|
Journal Page: 1847
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1846
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1857
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1815
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 1750
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1652
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Referred to Education
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1547
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 4479
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3075
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#914
|
Journal Page: 2802
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Record vote RV#914
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2801
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#883
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2732
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended
|
11-VanDeaver
|
Journal Page: 2731
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 11-VanDeaver
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 10-Hinojosa
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 9-Talarico
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 8-Landgraf
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 7-Toth and Schatzline
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 6-Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 5-Bucy
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 4-Talarico
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 3-Buckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amended 2-Buckley
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2721
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1928
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1576
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to Public Education
|
|
Journal Page: 590
|
House
|
03/09/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|