Senate | 05/17/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/17/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
Senate | 05/10/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1701 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3859 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3544 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Record vote | RV#1321 | Journal Page: 3543 |
House | 05/09/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3543 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3402 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Record vote | RV#1274 | Journal Page: 3402 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3402 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3402 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/01/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2792 | |
House | 04/18/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1781 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Public Education | Journal Page: 491 | |
House | 01/25/2023 | Filed |