LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB162
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB162
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB162
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/06/2023
House Supplemental Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
SB30
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective immediately
HB639
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1161
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1228
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB1363
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB162
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/05/2023
House Daily Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
HB639
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1161
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1228
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB1363
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB112
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB162
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
04/05/2023
House Supplemental Calendar Floor Session - Video Transcripts, AI Analysis and Details
HB4
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/18/2023 E See remarks for effective date
HB456
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB2468
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB471
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective immediately
HB729
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/17/2023 E Vetoed by the Governor
HB1315
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/23/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB796
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/27/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB727
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/06/2023 S Received from the House
HB639
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1161
Enrolled
Last Action: 05/24/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1228
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 1/1/24
HB1363
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB112
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/17/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB162
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
03/01/2023
8:00 am
Agriculture & Livestock Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E1.026
HB92
Engrossed
Last Action: 04/20/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB162
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB590
Engrossed
Last Action: 03/30/2023 S Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs