Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 967 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1408 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Record vote | RV#175 | Journal Page: 1407 |
House | 04/13/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1407 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1407 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1367 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Record vote | RV#166 | Journal Page: 1366 |
House | 04/12/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1366 | |
House | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/10/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1304 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred to Elections | Journal Page: 556 | |
House | 03/09/2023 | Filed |