Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1666 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 31, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Fiscal Note
Witness List

Engrossed

Bill April 20, 2023
Bill April 20, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 10, 2023
Analysis May 9, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Amendments Printing

Bill
Fiscal Note
Analysis

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023
Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 16, 2023
Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note May 8, 2023
Fiscal Note March 21, 2023
Fiscal Note March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 10, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 9, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023