Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2327
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2148
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
Senate
|
05/12/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1821
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4221
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3969
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1545
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Jetton
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Amended 1-Jetton
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3968
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/11/23 4:00 PM
|
Journal Page: 3916
|
House
|
05/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3892
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3821
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1466
|
Journal Page: 3820
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3820
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended
|
3-Swanson
|
Journal Page: 3820
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Amended 3-Swanson
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3818
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1855
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 494
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|