Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1689 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023
Bill January 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 24, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 8, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 8, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note March 11, 2023