LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1692
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1692
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1692
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/13/2023
8:00 am
Health Care Reform, Select Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB1578
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/04/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
HB1692
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB2002
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB2551
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H No action taken in committee
HB4990
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective immediately
HB3026
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/10/2023 S Referred to Health & Human Services
03/30/2023
8:00 am
Health Care Reform, Select Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.028
HB700
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB1575
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/02/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB1692
Introduced
Last Action: 04/13/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB2873
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
HB3317
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/04/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call