Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2682
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2543
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Rereferred to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2458
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2539
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3469
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3253
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1176
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3255
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3224
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3224
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2791
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
|
|
Journal Page: 496
|
House
|
01/26/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|