LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB1738
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB1738
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB1738
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
04/12/2023
10:30 am
County Affairs Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.012
HB993
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/15/2023 S Referred to Local Government
HB1738
Introduced
Last Action: 04/12/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB2878
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/13/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB717
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB3231
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB1330
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/10/2023 E Effective immediately
HB1807
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/25/2023 H Committee report sent to Calendars