Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1761 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/04/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Burns, Anderson (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 1761
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 17, 2023;
 April 27, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Water,
 Agriculture & Rural Affairs; May 4, 2023, reported favorably by the
 following vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 4, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the period for which a pesticide must be registered.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 76.041, Agriculture Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (g) and adding Subsection (g-1) to read as
 follows:
 (g)  Except as provided by Subsection (g-1), a [A] pesticide
 that has been registered with the department must continue to be
 registered until the earlier of:
 (1)  the second anniversary of the date the registrant
 stops distributing the pesticide in this state; or
 (2)  the date no [as long as the] pesticide remains in
 the channels of trade in this state.  [The registrant shall ensure
 that the pesticide continues to be registered.]
 (g-1)  A registrant that initiates a recall of a pesticide
 from distribution in this state before the pesticide's registration
 expires is not required to continue to register the pesticide after
 the expiration date.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *