Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1766 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 27, 2023
Bill January 27, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 24, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2023
Bill May 2, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2023
Bill May 26, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 22, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023
Fiscal Note April 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023