Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to Local Government
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1756
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 4049
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3750
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1424
|
Journal Page: 3749
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3749
|
House
|
05/10/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3749
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3642
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3642
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3642
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Postponed
|
5/9/23 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3336
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3336
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2914
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 503
|
House
|
01/27/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|