Senate | 05/11/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1756 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4049 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3764 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1436 | Journal Page: 3763 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 3763 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3763 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3701 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3701 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 906 | |
House | 03/16/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/16/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Corrections | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 302 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |