House | 05/11/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/09/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1928 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 507 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 507 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |