Senate | 05/15/2023 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
Senate | 04/24/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1199 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1929 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1819 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Record vote | RV#410 | Journal Page: 1818 |
House | 04/21/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1818 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1818 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1779 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Record vote | RV#383 | Journal Page: 1779 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1779 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Point of order overruled | Rule 4, Section 40 | Journal Page: 1778 |
House | 04/20/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1778 | |
House | 04/20/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1497 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1920 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 508 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |