Senate | 04/27/2023 | Referred to Education | Journal Page: 1396 | |
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1396 | |
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1354 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2343 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2075 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Record vote | RV#526 | Journal Page: 2074 |
House | 04/26/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/26/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2074 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1995 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Point of order sustained (amendment) | Rule 11, Section 2 | Journal Page: 1994 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Tinderholt | Journal Page: 1994 |
House | 04/25/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1994 | |
House | 04/25/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/19/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1793 | |
House | 04/13/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/13/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1396 | |
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Youth Health & Safety, Select | Journal Page: 303 | |
House | 11/14/2022 | Filed |