Senate | 04/18/2023 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1034 | |
Senate | 04/17/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 973 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Record vote | RV#199 | Journal Page: 1476 |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1476 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1462 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1462 | |
House | 04/14/2023 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/06/2023 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1048 | |
House | 03/28/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/28/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1034 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |