House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/04/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3211 | |
House | 04/21/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/21/2023 | Recalled from subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Left pending in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Committee substitute considered in s/c | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Considered by s/c in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . | ||
House | 04/04/2023 | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 511 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |