Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2539
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2326
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1986
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
Senate
|
05/09/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
Senate
|
05/08/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1617
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3110
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1109
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3109
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3045
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1071
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amended
|
1-Darby
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3044
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2048
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1690
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 511
|
House
|
02/03/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|