E | 05/27/2023 | Effective immediately | ||
E | 05/27/2023 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6429 | |
E | 05/16/2023 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4564 | |
Senate | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 1985 | |
House | 05/16/2023 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4384 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4387 | |
House | 05/15/2023 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4314 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 1888 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1888 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Record vote | Journal Page: 1888 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1888 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1888 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 1888 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 1887 | |
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2023 | Co-sponsor authorized | Journal Page: 1926 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1817 | |
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Vote taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Referred to Health & Human Services | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/04/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
Senate | 05/03/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1496 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2915 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2701 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Record vote | RV#862 | Journal Page: 2700 |
House | 05/02/2023 | Passed | Journal Page: 2700 | |
House | 05/02/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2700 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2560 | |
House | 05/01/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 987 | |
House | 03/27/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1577 | |
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 512 | |
House | 02/03/2023 | Filed |