Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB191 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 14, 2022
Bill November 14, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 25, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 22, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Bill May 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 22, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 22, 2023
Analysis April 25, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2023
Bill April 25, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 19, 2023
Fiscal Note April 17, 2023