Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1913 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/17/2023

                    By: Spiller (Senate Sponsor - Birdwell) H.B. No. 1913
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Transportation; May 17, 2023, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 17, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of a portion of Farm to Market Road 2526
 in Eastland County as the Sergeant Barbara Fenley Memorial Highway.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Subchapter B, Chapter 225, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 225.217 to read as follows:
 Sec. 225.217.  SERGEANT BARBARA FENLEY MEMORIAL HIGHWAY.
 (a) The portion of Farm to Market Road 2526 in Eastland County
 between its intersection with State Highway 6 and its intersection
 with Farm to Market Road 2689 is designated as the Sergeant Barbara
 Fenley Memorial Highway.  The designation is in addition to any
 other designation.
 (b)  Subject to Section 225.021(c), the department shall:
 (1)  design and construct markers indicating the
 designation as the Sergeant Barbara Fenley Memorial Highway and any
 other appropriate information; and
 (2)  erect a marker at each end of the highway and at
 appropriate intermediate sites along the highway.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *