Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1913 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 28, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 12, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 17, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 20, 2023
Bill May 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2023
Bill April 28, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 12, 2023
Analysis April 27, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 11, 2023
Fiscal Note April 16, 2023