Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1916 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023
Bill February 3, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 26, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023
Witness List

Engrossed

Analysis May 15, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Bill May 6, 2023
Fiscal Note

Analysis

Analysis May 15, 2023
Analysis April 26, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 26, 2023