Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1926 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/22/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Hull, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Paxton) H.B. No. 1926
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2023;
 May 10, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 21, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 10, Nays 0, one present not voting; May 21, 2023, sent to
 printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the expiration date and funding of the supplemental
 special education services program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 29.042(c), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (c)  The commissioner shall set aside an amount set by
 appropriation [not to exceed $30 million from the total amount of
 funds appropriated] for each state fiscal year to fund the program
 under this section. For each state fiscal year, the total amount
 provided for student grants under Subsection (a) may not exceed the
 amount set aside by the commissioner under this subsection.
 SECTION 2.  Section 29.050, Education Code, is repealed.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *