Senate | 05/12/2023 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1821 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 4221 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3937 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Record vote | RV#1538 | Journal Page: 3936 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Passed as amended | Journal Page: 3936 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Amended | 1-Moody | Journal Page: 3936 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3936 | |
House | 05/11/2023 | Postponed | After HJR 102 | Journal Page: 3875 |
House | 05/11/2023 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3875 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3937 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote | RV#1451 | Journal Page: 3791 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3791 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Amendment withdrawn | 5-S. Thompson | Journal Page: 3791 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Amendment withdrawn 5-S. Thompson | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote RV#1450 | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Amended | 4-Turner | Journal Page: 3789 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Amended 4-Turner | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Record vote RV#1449 | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Amendment withdrawn 2-Moody | ||
House | 05/10/2023 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32(c) | Journal Page: 3787 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3787 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Postponed | After HJR 102 | Journal Page: 3770 |
House | 05/10/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3770 | |
House | 05/10/2023 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/08/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1530 | |
House | 04/03/2023 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 541 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 541 | |
House | 02/06/2023 | Filed |