Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1949 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 05/04/2023

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Smith (Senate Sponsor - Springer) H.B. No. 1949
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 24, 2023;
 April 24, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Natural Resources & Economic Development; May 4, 2023, reported
 favorably by the following vote:  Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 4, 2023, sent
 to printer.)


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 BirdwellX
 ZaffiriniX
 AlvaradoX
 BlancoX
 HancockX
 HughesX
 KolkhorstX
 MilesX
 SparksX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the continuation of the Red River Boundary Commission.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 12.057(b), Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (b)  Not later than July 30, 2027 [2023], the commission
 shall issue a final report to the governor, lieutenant governor,
 speaker of the house of representatives, and appropriate committees
 of the legislature.
 SECTION 2.  Section 12.058, Natural Resources Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 12.058.  EXPIRATION OF SUBCHAPTER. This subchapter
 expires December 31, 2027 [2023].
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *