Senate
|
05/24/2023
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2023
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2429
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Vote taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2023
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 1986
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Reported from s/c with no recommendation
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2023
|
Considered by subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Referred to s/c on Higher Education by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
Senate
|
05/10/2023
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1702
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3859
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3566
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1341
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3565
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Amended
|
1-T. King
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1781
|
House
|
03/08/2023
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 543
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|