Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB1971 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 7, 2023
Bill February 7, 2023
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill April 18, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Analysis May 11, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Bill April 26, 2023
Fiscal Note

Senate Committee Report

Bill May 12, 2023
Witness List

Enrolled

Bill May 18, 2023
Bill May 18, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill May 12, 2023
Bill April 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 11, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note May 10, 2023
Fiscal Note April 13, 2023
Fiscal Note April 3, 2023