House | 05/09/2023 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3642 | |
House | 05/09/2023 | Companion considered in lieu of | CSSB 490 | Journal Page: 3641 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Postponed | 5/9/23 9:00 AM | Journal Page: 3458 |
House | 05/08/2023 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3458 | |
House | 05/08/2023 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2023 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2023 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2023 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2468 | |
House | 04/17/2023 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/03/2023 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 544 | |
House | 03/08/2023 | Read first time | Journal Page: 544 | |
House | 02/07/2023 | Filed |