House
|
05/09/2023
|
Returned to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Point of order sustained
|
Rule 8, Section 1, and Rule 8, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3663
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Record vote
|
RV#1394
|
Journal Page: 3662
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption
|
1-Neave Criado
|
Journal Page: 3655
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Amendment fails of adoption 1-Neave Criado
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Point of order withdrawn
|
Rule 4, Section 40, and Rule 11, Section 2
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3645
|
House
|
05/09/2023
|
Placed on Major State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2023
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2023
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 3346
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2023
|
Public hearing continued on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
House
|
03/13/2023
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 589
|
House
|
03/10/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|