LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Texas TX
Legislatures
2023 - 88th Regular
House
Bills
HB2020
Meeting Schedule
TX
Texas House Bill HB2020
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Texas 2023 - 88th Regular
Texas House Bill HB2020
Meeting Schedule
Calendar
Date
Event
Location
03/30/2023
10:30 am
Elections Committee Meeting - Video Transcripts, Minutes, and Details
E2.016
HB5131
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/11/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar
HB3046
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
HB1632
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/09/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB3611
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB2020
Introduced
Last Action: 03/30/2023 H Left pending in committee
HB703
House Committee Report
Last Action: 04/28/2023 H Laid on the table subject to call
HB4780
Engrossed
Last Action: 05/18/2023 S Left pending in committee
HB371
Senate Committee Report
Last Action: 05/24/2023 S Removed from local & uncontested calendar
HB153
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/08/2023 H Returned to committee: May 8 2023 5:08PM
HB1217
Enrolled
Last Action: 06/12/2023 E Effective on 9/1/23
HB5053
House Committee Report
Last Action: 05/10/2023 H Placed on General State Calendar