Texas 2023 - 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB205 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 15, 2022
Bill November 15, 2022
Fiscal Note

House Committee Report

Bill March 21, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Witness List
Fiscal Note

Engrossed

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill April 12, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 20, 2023

Fiscal Note

Fiscal Note March 15, 2023
Fiscal Note March 3, 2023