Texas 2023 88th Regular

Texas House Bill HB2073 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/10/2023

                    By: Price, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Schwertner) H.B. No. 2073
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2023;
 May 4, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 10, 2023, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 11, Nays 0; May 10, 2023, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 COMMITTEE VOTE
 YeaNayAbsentPNV
 SchwertnerX
 KingX
 BirdwellX
 CampbellX
 CreightonX
 JohnsonX
 KolkhorstX
 MenéndezX
 MiddletonX
 NicholsX
 ZaffiriniX
 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the recovery of fuel and purchased power costs by
 electric utilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 36.203, Utilities Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 36.203.  FUEL AND PURCHASED POWER COST RECOVERY;
 ADJUSTMENT OF FUEL FACTOR. (a) Section 36.201 does not prohibit
 the commission from reviewing and providing for adjustments of an
 electric [a] utility's fuel factor.
 (b)  The commission by rule shall implement procedures that
 provide for the timely adjustment of an electric [a] utility's fuel
 factor[, with or without a hearing].  The rules [procedures] must
 require that[:
 [(1)]  the findings required by Section 36.058
 regarding fuel transactions with affiliated interests be [are] made
 in a fuel reconciliation proceeding or in a rate case filed under
 Subchapter C or D.  The rules must ensure that:
 (1)  the utility collects as contemporaneously as
 reasonably possible the electric fuel and purchased power costs
 that the utility incurs and that the commission determines are
 eligible;
 (2)  the total of the utility's eligible electric fuel
 and purchased power costs, including any under-collected or
 over-collected amounts to be recovered through an interim fuel
 adjustment, is allocated among customer classes based on actual
 historical calendar month usage;
 (3)  any material balance of amounts under-collected or
 over-collected for eligible electric fuel and purchased power costs
 is collected from or refunded to customers through an interim fuel
 adjustment:
 (A)  not later than the 90th day after the date the
 balance is accrued; or
 (B)  if the adjustment would result in a total
 bill increase of 10 percent or more compared to the total bill in
 the month before implementation, not later than a date ordered by
 the commission which must be after the 90th day after the date the
 balance is accrued; and
 (4)[; and
 [(2)]  an affected party will receive notice and have
 the opportunity to request a hearing before the commission.
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b)(3), on a finding that an
 electric utility has an under-collected balance that is the result
 of extraordinary electric fuel and purchased power costs that are
 unlikely to continue, the commission may approve an interim fuel
 adjustment that would defer recovery to take place over a period
 longer than 90 days [The commission may adjust a utility's fuel
 factor without a hearing if the commission determines that a
 hearing is not necessary. If the commission holds a hearing, the
 commission may consider at the hearing any evidence that is
 appropriate and in the public interest].
 (d)  The commission is not required to hold a hearing on the
 adjustment of an electric utility's fuel factor under this section.
 If the commission holds a hearing, the commission may consider at
 the hearing any evidence that is appropriate and in the public
 interest [The commission shall render a timely decision approving,
 disapproving, or modifying the adjustment to the utility's fuel
 factor].
 (e)  A customer of the electric utility, a municipality with
 original jurisdiction over the utility, or the office may protest a
 fuel factor or interim fuel adjustment proposed under this section.
 The prudence of costs may not be considered in a fuel factor or
 interim fuel adjustment proceeding and may only be considered in a
 fuel reconciliation proceeding under Subsection (h) or another
 appropriate proceeding [The commission by rule shall provide for
 the reconciliation of a utility's fuel costs on a timely basis].
 (f)  The sole issue that may be considered on a protest of a
 fuel factor under Subsection (e) is whether the factor reasonably
 reflects costs the electric utility will incur so that the utility
 will not substantially under-collect or over-collect the utility's
 reasonably stated fuel and purchased power costs on an ongoing
 basis.  The commission may adjust the utility's fuel factor based on
 its determination on that issue.
 (g)  The commission shall hold a hearing on a protest of an
 interim fuel adjustment under Subsection (e) if the adjustment
 would result in a total bill increase of 10 percent or more as
 described by Subsection (b)(3) or if the adjustment results from
 extraordinary electric fuel and purchased power costs as described
 by Subsection (c).  In response to a protest of an interim fuel
 adjustment, if the commission finds that the electric utility is in
 a state of material under-collection or over-collection of the
 utility's reasonably stated eligible fuel and purchased power costs
 and is projected to remain in that state on an ongoing basis, the
 commission shall order the utility to establish or modify an
 interim fuel adjustment to address the under-collection or
 over-collection in a manner consistent with this section.
 (h)  An electric utility shall apply to reconcile the
 utility's electric fuel and purchased power costs at least once
 every two years. The application must be made not later than the
 180th day after the last day of the period to be reconciled. The
 commission may by rule establish the calendar year timing of the
 reconciliation period for each electric utility subject to this
 section to facilitate efficient work by the commission.  To the
 extent a reconciliation results in a change to the electric
 utility's under-collected or over-collected fuel balance, that
 change may be incorporated into an interim fuel adjustment as
 directed by the commission.
 (i)  A proceeding under this section is not a rate case under
 Subchapter C.
 SECTION 2.  The first time an electric utility applies to
 reconcile the utility's fuel costs and purchased power costs under
 Section 36.203(h), Utilities Code, as added by this Act, after the
 Public Utility Commission of Texas adopts the rules required to
 implement that subsection, the electric utility shall include in
 the application any period that has not been addressed in a previous
 reconciliation proceeding.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2023.
 * * * * *